08/29/2012 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |||
08/29/2012 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 26. Page 6550.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
08/28/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 50. Noes 27. Page 6439.) Ordered to third reading. | |||
08/23/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |||
03/26/2012 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |||
03/22/2012 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
03/22/2012 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 10. Page 2979.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
03/12/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
03/08/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 2916.) Ordered to second reading. | |||
02/16/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/07/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8. | |||
02/06/2012 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |