06/27/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 43, Statutes of 2012. | |||
06/27/2012 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
06/27/2012 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 6 p.m. | |||
06/27/2012 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 15. Page 4152.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
06/27/2012 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 49. Noes 29. Page 5478.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
06/25/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Page 5412.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
03/26/2012 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |||
03/22/2012 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
03/22/2012 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 10. Page 2980.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
03/12/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
03/08/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 2916.) Ordered to second reading. | |||
02/16/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/07/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8. | |||
02/06/2012 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |