|
01/23/2012
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 23. Page 1390.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E. Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 45. Noes 23. Page 808.)
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 499.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 382.) (March 17).
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
Set for hearing March 17.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 306.) (March 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2011
|
Set for hearing March 9.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 12.
|
|
|
|
01/12/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|