|
09/19/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 393, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 4676.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6008.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 5952.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 19).
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3493.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3389.) (May 1).
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/07/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8.
|
|
|
|
02/06/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|