California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1053 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2012

Amended

Bill August 20, 2012
Bill May 25, 2012
Bill April 19, 2012