04/16/2012 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/23/2012 | Set for hearing April 18. | |||
03/22/2012 | Set for hearing March 28. Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
03/21/2012 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
03/06/2012 | Set for hearing March 21. | |||
03/01/2012 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |||
02/10/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11. | |||
02/09/2012 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |