LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1058
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1058
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1058
Compare Versions
SB1058 Chaptered September 25, 2012
SB1058 Enrolled September 5, 2012
SB1058 Amended August 22, 2012
SB1058 Amended May 1, 2012
SB1058 Amended April 17, 2012
SB1058 Amended April 16, 2012
SB1058 Amended March 26, 2012
SB1058 Introduced February 13, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB1058 Chaptered September 25, 2012
SB1058 Enrolled September 5, 2012
SB1058 Amended August 22, 2012
SB1058 Amended May 1, 2012
SB1058 Amended April 17, 2012
SB1058 Amended April 16, 2012
SB1058 Amended March 26, 2012
SB1058 Introduced February 13, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare