04/19/2012 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 4. Page 3230.) Reconsideration granted. | |||
04/12/2012 | Set for hearing April 18. | |||
04/11/2012 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
03/29/2012 | Set for hearing April 11. | |||
03/26/2012 | Re-referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD. | |||
03/22/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/01/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/14/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15. | |||
02/13/2012 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |