01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/26/2011 | Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/20/2011 | Set for hearing May 26. | |||
05/02/2011 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/25/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/13/2011 | Set for hearing May 2. | |||
04/06/2011 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/01/2011 | Set for hearing April 11. | |||
03/16/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 358.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/04/2011 | Set for hearing March 15. | |||
02/10/2011 | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | |||
01/14/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 13. | |||
01/13/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |