|
08/13/2012
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Returned by the Governor at the request of the Senate. In Senate. Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 66. Noes 2. Page 5525.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19).
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 1. Page 3552.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
Set for hearing May 14.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3230.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
|
03/13/2012
|
Set for hearing March 21. Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
|
|
|
|
02/13/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|