LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1065
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1065
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1065
Compare Versions
SB1065 Chaptered September 17, 2012
SB1065 Enrolled September 5, 2012
SB1065 Amended August 6, 2012
SB1065 Amended May 29, 2012
SB1065 Introduced February 13, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB1065 Chaptered September 17, 2012
SB1065 Enrolled September 5, 2012
SB1065 Amended August 6, 2012
SB1065 Amended May 29, 2012
SB1065 Introduced February 13, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare