LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1067
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1067
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1067
Compare Versions
SB1067 Chaptered September 7, 2012
SB1067 Enrolled August 16, 2012
SB1067 Amended May 1, 2012
SB1067 Amended April 11, 2012
SB1067 Introduced February 13, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB1067 Chaptered September 7, 2012
SB1067 Enrolled August 16, 2012
SB1067 Amended May 1, 2012
SB1067 Amended April 11, 2012
SB1067 Introduced February 13, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare