07/09/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 64, Statutes of 2012. | |||
07/09/2012 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
06/28/2012 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |||
06/25/2012 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
06/25/2012 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5421.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
06/20/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |||
06/19/2012 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 19). | |||
06/07/2012 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
05/30/2012 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/29/2012 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3638.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
05/03/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/02/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3389.) (May 1). | |||
04/20/2012 | Set for hearing May 1. | |||
03/15/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
02/14/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15. | |||
02/13/2012 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |