LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1070
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1070
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1070
Compare Versions
SB1070 Chaptered September 21, 2012
SB1070 Enrolled September 5, 2012
SB1070 Amended August 23, 2012
SB1070 Amended August 20, 2012
SB1070 Amended August 6, 2012
SB1070 Amended July 5, 2012
SB1070 Amended June 11, 2012
SB1070 Amended March 26, 2012
SB1070 Introduced February 13, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB1070 Chaptered September 21, 2012
SB1070 Enrolled September 5, 2012
SB1070 Amended August 23, 2012
SB1070 Amended August 20, 2012
SB1070 Amended August 6, 2012
SB1070 Amended July 5, 2012
SB1070 Amended June 11, 2012
SB1070 Amended March 26, 2012
SB1070 Introduced February 13, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare