05/24/2012 | Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/18/2012 | Set for hearing May 24. | |||
05/07/2012 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/27/2012 | Set for hearing May 7. | |||
04/24/2012 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/23/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3229.) (April 18). | |||
04/12/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
03/14/2012 | Set for hearing April 18. | |||
03/01/2012 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
02/15/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. | |||
02/14/2012 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |