|
09/13/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 310, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 7:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4857.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5967.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3666.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3445.) (May 7).
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3314.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3207.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2012
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|