California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1077 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 11, 2012

Amended

Bill June 27, 2012
Bill May 1, 2012