06/26/2012 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/11/2012 | Referred to Com. on W., P. & W. | |||
05/31/2012 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/31/2012 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 3742.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
05/29/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3590.) (May 24). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/18/2012 | Set for hearing May 24. | |||
05/07/2012 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/27/2012 | Set for hearing May 7. | |||
04/24/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3265.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/17/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |||
03/29/2012 | Set for hearing April 24. | |||
03/08/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |||
03/06/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/01/2012 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
02/15/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. | |||
02/14/2012 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |