05/21/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |||
04/24/2012 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 4. Page 3311.) | |||
03/30/2012 | Set for hearing April 24. | |||
03/28/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3036.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
03/20/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
03/13/2012 | Set for hearing March 28. | |||
03/08/2012 | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and PUB. S. | |||
02/15/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. | |||
02/14/2012 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |