05/24/2012 | Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/18/2012 | Set for hearing May 24. | |||
04/30/2012 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/20/2012 | Set for hearing April 30. | |||
03/28/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3033.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/22/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. (Corrected March 27.) | |||
03/16/2012 | Set for hearing March 28. | |||
03/01/2012 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
02/15/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. | |||
02/14/2012 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |