|
09/22/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 453, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 4963.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6340.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6003.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3496.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3387.) (April 30).
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3036.) (March 28).
|
|
|
|
03/09/2012
|
Set for hearing March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|