California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1082 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 22, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 7, 2012

Amended

Bill August 6, 2012
Bill June 21, 2012
Bill April 24, 2012
Bill April 9, 2012