05/09/2012 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 6. Page 3457.) Reconsideration granted. | |||
04/09/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |||
03/28/2012 | Set for hearing May 9. | |||
03/27/2012 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
03/22/2012 | Set for hearing April 25. | |||
03/01/2012 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |||
02/16/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. | |||
02/15/2012 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |