|
08/16/2012
|
Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26).
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3642.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3590.) (May 24).
|
|
|
|
05/18/2012
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3264.) (April 10).
|
|
|
|
04/05/2012
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/13/2012
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/13/2012
|
Set for hearing March 27.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|