07/17/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 148, Statutes of 2012. | |||
07/17/2012 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
07/05/2012 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. | |||
07/02/2012 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
07/02/2012 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 5564.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
06/27/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |||
06/26/2012 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26). | |||
06/14/2012 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
04/23/2012 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
04/23/2012 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3241.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
04/19/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
04/18/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3208.) (April 17). | |||
03/13/2012 | Set for hearing April 17. | |||
02/16/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. | |||
02/15/2012 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |