|
09/22/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 454, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4682.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6065.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5751.)
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & C.P. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3401.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3387.) (April 30).
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3086.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2012
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|