|
09/13/2012
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5967.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3528.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3311.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2012
|
Set for hearing March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|