|
09/06/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 253, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1915.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2268.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1067.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 950.) (May 10).
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2011
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
|
01/18/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 14.
|
|
|
|
01/14/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|