|
09/07/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 272, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4624.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5967.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3399.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3034.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2012
|
Set for hearing March 27.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|