LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1114
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB1114
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1114
Action History
05/14/2012
Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
04/11/2012
Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 4. Page 3122.)
03/29/2012
Set for hearing April 11.
03/01/2012
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
02/21/2012
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
02/17/2012
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.