05/14/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |||
05/09/2012 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 0. Noes 4. Page 3460.) | |||
05/03/2012 | Set for hearing May 9. | |||
04/11/2012 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 3. Page 3122.) Reconsideration granted. | |||
03/29/2012 | Set for hearing April 11. | |||
03/01/2012 | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | |||
02/21/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. | |||
02/17/2012 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |