|
09/07/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 274, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4625.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5968.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26).
|
|
|
|
06/15/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on J., E.D. & E. and B. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3643.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3590.) (May 24).
|
|
|
|
05/18/2012
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
Set for hearing May 14.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3262.) (April 23).
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3119.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2012
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and E.Q.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|