LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1117
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1117
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1117
Compare Versions
SB1117 Enrolled August 31, 2012
SB1117 Amended August 20, 2012
SB1117 Amended July 5, 2012
SB1117 Amended June 26, 2012
SB1117 Amended May 1, 2012
SB1117 Amended March 29, 2012
SB1117 Introduced February 17, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB1117 Enrolled August 31, 2012
SB1117 Amended August 20, 2012
SB1117 Amended July 5, 2012
SB1117 Amended June 26, 2012
SB1117 Amended May 1, 2012
SB1117 Amended March 29, 2012
SB1117 Introduced February 17, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare