|
08/31/2012
|
Read second time. Amended. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6750.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 48. Noes 31. Page 6784.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (August 29).
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 6404.)
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 6257.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 2).
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2012
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 17. Page 3752.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3591.) (May 24).
|
|
|
|
05/18/2012
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3262.) (April 23).
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|