LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1120
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1120
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1120
Compare Versions
SB1120 Amended July 3, 2012
SB1120 Amended June 20, 2012
SB1120 Amended June 14, 2012
SB1120 Amended April 9, 2012
SB1120 Introduced February 17, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB1120 Amended July 3, 2012
SB1120 Amended June 20, 2012
SB1120 Amended June 14, 2012
SB1120 Amended April 9, 2012
SB1120 Introduced February 17, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare