California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1121 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2012

Amended

Bill August 16, 2012
Bill May 25, 2012
Bill April 9, 2012