|
09/27/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 612, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 5. Page 5096.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6704.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 56. Noes 14. Page 6704.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 6587.) From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 29).
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 6257.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3712.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3591.) (May 24). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2012
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 3303.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|