04/25/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |||
04/24/2012 | Set, final hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/17/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |||
04/12/2012 | Set for hearing April 24. | |||
04/11/2012 | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/05/2012 | Set for hearing April 17. | |||
04/04/2012 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/06/2012 | Set for hearing April 10. | |||
03/01/2012 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | |||
02/21/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. | |||
02/17/2012 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |