04/17/2012 | Set, final hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 4. Page 3208.) Reconsideration granted. | |||
04/09/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
03/27/2012 | Set for hearing April 17. | |||
03/26/2012 | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/22/2012 | Set for hearing April 10. | |||
03/21/2012 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/09/2012 | Set for hearing March 27. | |||
03/01/2012 | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR. | |||
02/21/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. | |||
02/17/2012 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |