|
09/27/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 677, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4970.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6454.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6253.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Action rescinded whereby the committee report from the Com. on J., E.D. & E. was adopted. Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D. & E.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D. & E. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D. & E. From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5409.)
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and J., E.D. & E.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3713.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3591.) (May 24). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2012
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
Set for hearing May 14.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 3303.) (April 24).
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E., U. & C. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3120.) (April 11).
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and E., U. & C.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. (Corrected February 23.)
|
|
|