|
08/16/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (July 2).
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3553.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Set for hearing May 14.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 3303.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|