LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1131
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1131
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1131
Compare Versions
SB1131 Chaptered July 9, 2012
SB1131 Enrolled June 26, 2012
SB1131 Amended May 8, 2012
SB1131 Amended April 25, 2012
SB1131 Introduced February 21, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB1131 Chaptered July 9, 2012
SB1131 Enrolled June 26, 2012
SB1131 Amended May 8, 2012
SB1131 Amended April 25, 2012
SB1131 Introduced February 21, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare