LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1133
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1133
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1133
Compare Versions
SB1133 Chaptered September 24, 2012
SB1133 Enrolled August 30, 2012
SB1133 Amended August 21, 2012
SB1133 Amended June 27, 2012
SB1133 Amended May 24, 2012
SB1133 Amended May 1, 2012
SB1133 Amended April 18, 2012
SB1133 Amended March 29, 2012
SB1133 Introduced February 21, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB1133 Chaptered September 24, 2012
SB1133 Enrolled August 30, 2012
SB1133 Amended August 21, 2012
SB1133 Amended June 27, 2012
SB1133 Amended May 24, 2012
SB1133 Amended May 1, 2012
SB1133 Amended April 18, 2012
SB1133 Amended March 29, 2012
SB1133 Introduced February 21, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare