07/17/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 149, Statutes of 2012. | |||
07/17/2012 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
07/05/2012 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. | |||
07/02/2012 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
07/02/2012 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 5562.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
06/27/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |||
06/26/2012 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 26). | |||
06/11/2012 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
05/14/2012 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/14/2012 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3496.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
05/09/2012 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | |||
05/08/2012 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/07/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3389.) (May 1). | |||
04/20/2012 | Set for hearing May 1. | |||
03/28/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
02/22/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | |||
02/21/2012 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |