05/24/2012 | Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/22/2012 | Set for hearing May 24. | |||
05/21/2012 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
05/17/2012 | Set for hearing May 21. | |||
05/16/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/09/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
05/04/2012 | Set for hearing May 16. | |||
05/03/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
04/30/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/01/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/22/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | |||
02/21/2012 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |