07/03/2012 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/07/2012 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
05/30/2012 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/30/2012 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3715.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
05/25/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/24/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3591.) (May 24). | |||
05/18/2012 | Set for hearing May 24. | |||
05/07/2012 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/27/2012 | Set for hearing May 7. | |||
04/26/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3306.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/16/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
04/05/2012 | Set for hearing April 25. | |||
02/22/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | |||
02/21/2012 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |