05/24/2012 | Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/22/2012 | Set for hearing May 24. | |||
05/21/2012 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
05/11/2012 | Set for hearing May 21. | |||
05/02/2012 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/01/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3301.) (April 25). | |||
04/13/2012 | Set for hearing April 25. | |||
04/12/2012 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/28/2012 | Set for hearing April 18. | |||
03/01/2012 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
02/22/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | |||
02/21/2012 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |