LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1143
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB1143
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1143
Action History
04/18/2012
Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 4. Page 3208.) Reconsideration granted.
04/13/2012
Set for hearing April 18.
04/09/2012
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
03/01/2012
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
02/22/2012
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
02/21/2012
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.