07/13/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 133, Statutes of 2012. | |||
07/13/2012 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
07/05/2012 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. | |||
07/02/2012 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
07/02/2012 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5561.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
06/27/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
06/26/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26). | |||
06/18/2012 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
04/23/2012 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
04/23/2012 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3240.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
04/10/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3105.) (April 10). | |||
03/29/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
03/09/2012 | Set for hearing April 10. | |||
02/22/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | |||
02/21/2012 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |