05/21/2012 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
05/17/2012 | Set for hearing May 21. | |||
05/15/2012 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/14/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3457.) (May 9). | |||
05/08/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3460.) (May 8). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |||
05/04/2012 | Set for hearing May 9 in GOV. & F. pending receipt. | |||
05/01/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. Set for hearing May 8. | |||
04/10/2012 | Set for hearing April 24. | |||
03/01/2012 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | |||
02/22/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | |||
02/21/2012 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |